UT HB0322 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Education Tenure
Title
Higher Education Tenure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in HSUB | |
2012-02-08 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-08 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-07 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-07 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-06 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-06 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-02 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-02 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-01 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0322.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/hbillint/hb0322.pdf |