UT HB0316 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation of Surplus Lines of Insurance
Title
Taxation of Surplus Lines of Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-17 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-28 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-28 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-23 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTREV | |
2011-02-16 | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV | |
2011-02-15 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-15 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-11 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-10 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |