UT HB0313 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Charter School Funding Amendments
Title
Charter School Funding Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE | |
2011-03-07 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-04 | House/ lifted from Rules in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-01 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-01 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-24 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-23 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-16 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-15 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |