UT HB0306 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Terrorism Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Terrorism Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-29 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2010-03-19 House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2010-03-16 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2010-03-11 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2010-03-11 Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2010-03-11 Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
2010-03-11 Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL
2010-03-03 Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTEDU
2010-03-01 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2010-02-19 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2010-02-19 House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB
2010-02-17 House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2010-02-16 House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS
2010-02-11 House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL
2010-02-10 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2010-02-08 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2010-02-05 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2010-02-05 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback