UT HB0304 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign Finance Revisions
Title
Campaign Finance Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-14 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-11 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-10 | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-07 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-07 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-02 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTBUS | |
2011-03-02 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2011-03-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTBUS | |
2011-03-01 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2011-03-01 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-03-01 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |