UT HB0302 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Tax
Title
Modifications to Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | House Comm - Held in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |