UT HB0299 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elector Amendments
Title
Elector Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Brian King [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTGOC |
2014-03-10 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTGOC |
2014-02-06 | House | House Comm - Held in HSTGOC |
2014-02-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-02-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-02-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-29 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-01-29 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-29 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |