UT HB0299 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments Related to Substances Harmful to Pregnancy
Title
Amendments Related to Substances Harmful to Pregnancy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2010-02-19 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-18 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-18 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2010-02-12 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTHHS | |
2010-02-12 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2010-02-09 | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS | |
2010-02-09 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-05 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage Control
Alcoholic Beverages
Business
Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control
Department of Health
Health
Alcoholic Beverages
Business
Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control
Department of Health
Health