UT HB0296 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Peace Officer Training Amendments
Title
Peace Officer Training Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-16 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2022-02-14 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-01 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Antidiscrimination
Department of Public Safety
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Public Safety
Victims
Department of Public Safety
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Public Safety
Victims