UT HB0295 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTEDU
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTEDU
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanded Uses of School District Property Tax Revenue
Title
Expanded Uses of School District Property Tax Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTEDU | |
2010-02-26 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2010-02-10 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-09 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-05 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0295.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0295.pdf |