UT HB0293 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Victims' Rights Amendments
Title
Victims' Rights Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB | |
2010-02-17 | House Comm - Held in HSTJUD | |
2010-02-09 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0293.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0293.pdf |