UT HB0289 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grandparent Visitation Amendments
Title
Grandparent Visitation Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 40 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-09 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-03-06 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-03 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-03 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-03-03 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-03-03 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-03-03 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-03-01 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |