UT HB0288 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
New Growth Amendments
Title
New Growth Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-01 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 2 | 924 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 259 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |