UT HB0288 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Enrollment Transcripts
Title
Concurrent Enrollment Transcripts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-09 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-09 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-07 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-04 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSEC | |
2011-03-04 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-03-04 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-02 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-28 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-28 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-24 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-23 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |