UT HB0284 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Procedure Amendments
Title
Criminal Procedure Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House/ failed (Y: 30 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-22 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-02-22 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-12 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-30 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |