UT HB0283 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safety Belt Enforcement Amendments
Title
Safety Belt Enforcement Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2013-03-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-03-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTTRA |
2013-03-06 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTTRA |
2013-02-26 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in HSTTRA |
2013-02-20 | House | House Comm - Held in HSTTRA |
2013-02-15 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-01-30 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-01-30 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-28 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |