UT HB0277 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Music Therapist Licensure Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Music Therapist Licensure Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2014-03-21 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2014-03-20HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2014-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2014-03-18 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2014-03-16 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ to House in HSPKR
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2014-03-10SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2014-03-10SenateSenate/ received from House in SINTRO
2014-03-10SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2014-03-10SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2014-03-10HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2014-03-06HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB
2014-03-05HouseHouse/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL
2014-02-26HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2014-02-26HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTBUS
2014-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS
2014-02-26HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTBUS
2014-02-10HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTBUS
2014-02-10HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2014-02-07HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2014-02-07HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2014-02-04HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-02-04HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2014-02-04 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2014-02-04 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-02-04 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback