UT HB0275 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Contraception for Women Prisoners
Title
Contraception for Women Prisoners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-20 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | House Comm - Held in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-05 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |