UT HB0272 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Indigent Defense Act Amendments
Title
Indigent Defense Act Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Lyle Hillyard [R] | Rep. Kay McIff [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-09 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-09 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-23 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-23 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-02-22 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-02-18 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-14 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-11 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTJUD | |
2011-02-08 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTJUD | |
2011-02-07 | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD | |
2011-02-07 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |