UT HB0268 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Hearing: Feb 24 @ 4:00 pm in Room 250 State Capitol
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Property Tax Notice Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Notice Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-02-20SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-02-20SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-02-20SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2020-02-20HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar
2020-02-18HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar
2020-02-18HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-02-14HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-02-13HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2020-02-13HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2020-02-10HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee
2020-02-06HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-02-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-02-05 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-02-05 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-02-05 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback