UT HB0266 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Cosmetology Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cosmetology Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2021-03-02HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee
2021-03-02HouseHouse Comm - Returned to Rules in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-08HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-05HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2021-02-05HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2021-02-02HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee
2021-01-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-28HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-01-28 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-28 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-28 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback