UT HB0264 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled Parking Fine Amendments
Title
Disabled Parking Fine Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Jen Seelig [D] | Sen. Karen Mayne [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-18 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-18 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-28 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-27 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-27 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTTPT |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-10 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-10 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ 3rd reading in HCON |
2014-02-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HCON |
2014-02-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTTRA |
2014-02-06 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTTRA |
2014-02-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTTRA |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-23 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCLERK |
2014-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-20 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2014-01-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-01-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |