UT HB0263 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local District Services Amendments
Title
Local District Services Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. David Clark [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-11 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB | |
2011-02-07 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTGOC | |
2011-02-02 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-01 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-31 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-31 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0263.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hb0263.pdf |