UT HB0259 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Straight Ticket Voting Prohibition Amendments
Title
Straight Ticket Voting Prohibition Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-01 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-26 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-21 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-21 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |