UT HB0255 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property Tax Assessment Modifications
Title
Property Tax Assessment Modifications
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kohler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-11 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/static/HB0255.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/hbillint/HB0255.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2024/HB0255.fn.pdf |