UT HB0253 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer of the Bureau of Emergency Medical Services from the Department of Health to the Department of Public Safety
Title
Transfer of the Bureau of Emergency Medical Services from the Department of Health to the Department of Public Safety
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Ray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE | |
2010-03-03 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTGOC | |
2010-02-03 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-28 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0253.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0253.pdf |