UT HB0252 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ to House in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Railroad and Railroad Crossing Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroad and Railroad Crossing Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 Senate/ to House in HCLERK
2011-03-07 Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL
2011-03-02 Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2011-03-02 Senate/ circled in S2ND
2011-02-28 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2011-02-25 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTTPT
2011-02-16 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-02-15 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-02-15 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2011-02-07 House/ committee report favorable in HSTTRA
2011-02-03 House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA
2011-02-02 House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL
2011-02-01 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2011-01-31 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO
2011-01-27 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-01-27 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback