UT HB0249 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-24 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-24 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Single Family Zoning Designation
Title
Single Family Zoning Designation
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Sanpei [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-24 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB | |
2012-01-23 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTPOL | |
2012-01-23 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTPOL | |
2012-01-23 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTPOL | |
2012-01-23 | House/ to standing committee in HSTPOL | |
2012-01-23 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-23 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCLERK | |
2012-01-20 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-01-12 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2012-01-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-06 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0249.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/hbillint/hb0249.pdf |