UT HB0240 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcohol Service in Restaurants
Title
Alcohol Service in Restaurants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-22 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-21 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2013-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-19 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-08 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-08 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-03-08 | House | Senate/ intent language in HSPKR |
2013-03-08 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-08 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTBUS |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-02-28 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-27 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTBUS |
2013-02-25 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-02-25 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-02-22 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS |
2013-02-15 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-12 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-12 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |