UT HB0239 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Governmental Entity Budget Transparency
Title
Governmental Entity Budget Transparency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House/ failed (Y: 29 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-21 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House file for bills not passed |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-26 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Counties
County and Municipal Finance
Education
Fiscal Procedures
Government Operations (State Issues)
Interlocal Cooperation
Interlocal Entities
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Local Districts
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Public Budgeting
Public Transit Districts
Revenue and Taxation
Transportation
County and Municipal Finance
Education
Fiscal Procedures
Government Operations (State Issues)
Interlocal Cooperation
Interlocal Entities
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Local Districts
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Public Budgeting
Public Transit Districts
Revenue and Taxation
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 6 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 36 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63J | 1 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78A | 2 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78A | 2 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |