UT HB0239 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Candidate Vacancy for Failure to File Campaign Finance Interim Report
Title
Candidate Vacancy for Failure to File Campaign Finance Interim Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE | |
2011-03-04 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-31 | House Comm - Held in HSTGOC | |
2011-01-27 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-26 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |