UT HB0238 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Radiology Technologist and Radiology Practical Technician Licensing Act
Title
Radiology Technologist and Radiology Practical Technician Licensing Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-02-24 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-02-23 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-22 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-22 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-02-22 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2011-02-18 | Senate/ circled in S3RD | |
2011-02-17 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-11 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-10 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-10 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-02 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTBUS | |
2011-02-01 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2011-01-28 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-28 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |