UT HB0236 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abandoned Roads
Title
Abandoned Roads
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-03 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-02 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTPOL | |
2011-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTPOL | |
2011-01-31 | House/ to standing committee in HSTPOL | |
2011-01-28 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |