UT HB0230 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exemptions from Collection Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exemptions from Collection Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2019-03-22 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2019-03-22HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2019-03-22HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2019-03-22HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-03-12 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-03-12 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-03-12 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-03-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2019-03-12HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2019-03-12HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2019-03-12SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2019-03-11SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2019-03-11SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President
2019-03-08HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2019-03-08HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-03-08HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2019-03-08HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2019-03-08SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-03-08SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-03-08SenateSenate/ substituted from # 2 to # 4 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-03-08SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-03-08SenateHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-03-07SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-03-07SenateSenate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-03-07SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate Consent Calendar
2019-03-07SenateSenate/ circled in Senate Consent Calendar
2019-03-07SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2019-03-04SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2019-03-04SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2019-03-04SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2019-03-04SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2019-03-04SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-02-20SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2019-02-20SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2019-02-20HouseHouse/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-20HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-20HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-11HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-11HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-02-07HouseHouse Comm - Held in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-02-06HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2019-02-05HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2019-01-31 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-01-31 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/static/HB0230.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillint/HB0230.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillint/HB0230S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillamd/HB0230S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillint/HB0230S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillamd/HB0230S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillint/HB0230S04.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/hbillenr/HB0230.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/HB0230.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/HB0230S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/HB0230S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/HB0230S04.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=10782
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=10866
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=10867
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=10868
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=10869
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2019GS&voteid=361&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=12369
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=12370
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=12372
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2019GS&voteid=1195&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2019GS&voteid=921&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback