UT HB0229 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Air Contaminant Definition Change

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Air Contaminant Definition Change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ filed in HFILE
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK
2014-03-10HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL
2014-03-10HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in HSTNAE
2014-03-07HouseHouse Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTNAE
2014-03-04HouseHouse Comm - Held in HSTNAE
2014-03-04HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTNAE
2014-02-18HouseHouse Comm - Held in HSTNAE
2014-02-11HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTNAE
2014-01-27HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-01-22HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Printing in HCLERK
2014-01-15 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC
2014-01-08 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC
2014-01-03 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2014-01-03 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-01-03 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback