UT HB0225 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water Commissioner Amendments
Title
Water Commissioner Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-09 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2017-02-28 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2017-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-02-28 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-02-21 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-01-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |