UT HB0220 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cold War Medal for Veterans State Symbol
Title
Cold War Medal for Veterans State Symbol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2017-01-30 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-01-30 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-01-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/static/HB0220.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/hbillint/HB0220.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/HB0220.fn.pdf |