UT HB0220 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Became Law w/o Governor Signature in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Legislative Organization Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative Organization Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30 Became Law w/o Governor Signature in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2016-03-17 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2016-03-16 House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2016-03-16 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2016-03-15 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-03-10 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-03-10 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2016-03-10HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2016-03-10HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2016-03-10HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2016-03-10SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2016-03-10SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2016-03-10SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President
2016-03-10HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Concurrence Calendar
2016-03-09HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Concurrence Calendar
2016-03-09HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2016-03-09 House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2016-03-09 Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2016-03-09 Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2016-03-09SenateSenate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-03-09SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-03-09SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-03-09SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-03-09SenateLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-03-09SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-03-08SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2016-03-03SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2016-03-03SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-03-02SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-03-01SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-26SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2016-02-25SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2016-02-25 Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2016-02-23SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2016-02-23SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2016-02-23HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2016-02-11HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2016-02-11HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee
2016-02-10HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee
2016-02-08HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee
2016-02-01HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2016-01-27HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2016-01-27 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2016-01-27 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-01-27 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/static/HB0220.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/hbillint/HB0220.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/hbillint/HB0220S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/hbillenr/HB0220.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=5455&sequence=10299
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=408&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=6036&sequence=22986
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=5455&sequence=30273
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/asp/votes/comvotes.asp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=6036&sequence=30283
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=1437&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2016GS&voteid=1124&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback