UT HB0219 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Use of Public Buildings
Title
Use of Public Buildings
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nielson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in HSUB | |
2012-02-13 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTGOC | |
2012-02-13 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTGOC | |
2012-02-07 | House Comm - Held in HSTGOC | |
2012-02-06 | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC | |
2012-02-06 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-03 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-03 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-30 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Counties
Government Operations (State Issues)
Local Boards of Education
Municipal Government
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Education
Public Meetings
Townships
Government Operations (State Issues)
Local Boards of Education
Municipal Government
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Education
Public Meetings
Townships
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0219.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/hbillint/hb0219.pdf |