UT HB0218 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Revised Nonprofit Corporation Act
Title
Utah Revised Nonprofit Corporation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kay McIff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-27 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/static/HB0218.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/hbillint/HB0218.pdf |