UT HB0216 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homeless Coordinating Committee Amendments
Title
Homeless Coordinating Committee Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2017-01-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-01-26 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-01-26 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/static/HB0216.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/hbillint/HB0216.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/HB0216.fn.pdf |