UT HB0216 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-26 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTPOL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Incorporation of a Town Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incorporation of a Town Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-26 Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTPOL
2010-01-25 House/ to standing committee in HSTPOL
2010-01-19 House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HDOCKET
2010-01-08 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HDOCKET
2010-01-08 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET
2010-01-06 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2009-11-19 LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback