UT HB0214 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance Coverage Modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Coverage Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-20SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-19SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-02-19SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-02-18SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-02-14HouseHouse/ held in House Docket Clerk
2020-02-14SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2020-02-14HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-14HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-13HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-11HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-11HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-10HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-10HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-05HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-03HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2020-01-29HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-01-29HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-01-28 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-01-28 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback