UT HB0213 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled Parking Permit Amendments
Title
Disabled Parking Permit Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House/ failed (Y: 37 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House/ failed (Y: 23 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House/ failed (Y: 23 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-24 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-24 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House file for bills not passed |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |