UT HB0207 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTLAW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTLAW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protection of Property Amendment
Title
Protection of Property Amendment
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Wimmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTLAW | |
2010-01-25 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2010-01-19 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-07 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-12-28 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0207.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0207.pdf |