UT HB0205 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic Violence and Dating Violence Amendments
Title
Domestic Violence and Dating Violence Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Ray [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE | |
2011-03-04 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-01 | House Comm - Held in HSTJUD | |
2011-01-27 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTJUD | |
2011-01-24 | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD | |
2011-01-22 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HINTRO | |
2011-01-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HINTRO | |
2011-01-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |