UT HB0204 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expedited Jury Trial Act Amendments
Title
Expedited Jury Trial Act Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2012-03-16 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-03-16 | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-15 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2012-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-02-17 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-16 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-15 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-15 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ uncircled in SCON | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ circled in SCON | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTJLC | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2012-02-02 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-31 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2012-01-31 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-01-31 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2012-01-31 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-01-26 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2012-01-26 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTJUD | |
2012-01-24 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTJUD | |
2012-01-23 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTJUD | |
2012-01-23 | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD | |
2012-01-23 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-20 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-01-16 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2012-01-12 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2011-12-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-12-20 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |