UT HB0202 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Signature Threshold Amendments
Title
Signature Threshold Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House/ floor amendment failed (Y: 17 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House/ floor amendment failed (Y: 17 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-02 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2023-02-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ floor amendment failed in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-01-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-01-27 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee |
2023-01-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-15 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-15 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-11 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |