UT HB0198 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Assertive Community Mental Health Treatment Pilot Program
Title
Assertive Community Mental Health Treatment Pilot Program
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Moss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE | |
2010-01-19 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-06 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2009-12-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-12-08 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0198.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0198.pdf |