UT HB0197 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Feb 21 @ 4:00 pm in Room 250 State Capitol
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Cannabis Cultivation Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis Cultivation Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ failed (Y: 36 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2018-02-14SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2018-02-14SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-02-14SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-02-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-02-13SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2018-02-13HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-13HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-12HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-12HouseHouse/ motion to reconsider in Clerk of the House
2018-02-09HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House file for bills not passed
2018-02-09HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2018-02-09HouseHouse/ failed in Clerk of the House
2018-02-09HouseHouse/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-09HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-09HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-01HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-01HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-31HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-31HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-26HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-24HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2018-01-22 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-01-22 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback